CO HB1280 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update Air Ambulance Regulation
Title
Update Air Ambulance Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1280 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2016-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2016-02-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |