CO HB1278 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create HOA Ombudsman
Title
Create HOA Ombudsman
Sponsors
Sen. Morgan Carroll [D] | Rep. Su Ryden [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that House Bill 10-1278 be referred to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1278, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that House Bill 10-1278 be referred to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1278, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs + Appropriations | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-19 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-24 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-02-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations |