CO HB1276 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-7)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-7)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the Colorado commission for the deaf, hard of hearing, and deafblind, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2023 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Process Commission Deaf Hard of Hearing Deafblind
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1276 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1276 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1276 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1276 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |