CO HB1276 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conduct Emergency Responses At Legacy Mining Sites
Title
Conduct Emergency Responses At Legacy Mining Sites
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1276 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Move to reconsider previous motion strike line 15 and 16 on Page 3 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment, Page 3, strike line 15 and 16 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1276 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1276 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1276 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Move to reconsider previous motion strike line 15 and 16 on Page 3 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment, Page 3, strike line 15 and 16 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1276 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1276 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2016-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |