CO HB1275 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning providing in-state tuition status at a community college for military families regardless of whether Colorado domicile status is satisfied.
Title
In-state Tuition At Community College For Military
Sponsors
Rep. Bri Buentello [D] | Sen. Dennis Hisey [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1275 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1275 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1275, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-14 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2020-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |