CO HB1275 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation Of Corp Income Sheltered In Tax Haven
Title
Taxation Of Corp Income Sheltered In Tax Haven
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275 to the Committee on Finance with a favorable recommendation (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1275 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1275 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1275, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/09/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-03-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |