CO HB1274 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ID Documents Unlawful Presence
Title
ID Documents Unlawful Presence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1274 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1274 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1274 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1274 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1274 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1274 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1274 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |