CO HB1272 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Driver-improvement School Evaluation
Title
Driver-improvement School Evaluation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1272 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-04-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations | |
2011-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-12 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-11 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-08 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-01 | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations |