CO HB1269 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marketplace Fairness & Small Business Protection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marketplace Fairness & Small Business Protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1269 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06HouseGovernor Signed
2014-05-02HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-01HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-28SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2014-04-14HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-11HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-03-05HouseHouse Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2014-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2014-02-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6E7335C939D8631287257C390066585A?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6E7335C939D8631287257C390066585A/$FILE/1269_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6E7335C939D8631287257C390066585A/$FILE/1269fin_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6E7335C939D8631287257C390066585A/$FILE/1269_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6E7335C939D8631287257C390066585A/$FILE/1269_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6E7335C939D8631287257C390066585A/$FILE/1269_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6E7335C939D8631287257C390066585A/$FILE/1269_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6E7335C939D8631287257C390066585A/$FILE/1269_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E21CF17639FE8B6787257CAE006FB1A6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CE0ED9E5084E486287257CAE006F8A92
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7A78F28ACAC817E987257CAE006FADE1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B1867DB1CC87D25D87257CC200771903

Bill Comments

feedback