CO HB1267 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use Of Medical Marijuana During Probation
Title
Use Of Medical Marijuana During Probation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1267 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1267 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1267 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-27 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2015-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |