CO HB1267 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government & Black-footed Ferrets
Title
Local Government & Black-footed Ferrets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1267 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-17 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-10 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |