CO HB1265 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning increased public protections from emissions of air toxics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase Public Protection Air Toxics Emissions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1265, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1265, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1265, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11SenateSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2020-06-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-03-09HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1265
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1265_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1265_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1265_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1265_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1265_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1265_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e366d3024ef5d7db87258526007b3a04-hb20-1265-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e366d3024ef5d7db87258526007b3a04-hb20-1265-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a20e592ced894d3b8725857600714275-hb20-1265-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/55db73869bed476e8725857c0061ea2f-hb20-1265-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1265vote05e7a2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fb1abaebb9cb84b48725858200188733-hb20-1265-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1265vote65d2ce
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1265vote6760cb

Bill Comments

feedback