CO HB1263 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Racial Profiling Prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Racial Profiling Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-10HouseGovernor Signed
2016-05-05HouseSent to the Governor
2016-05-05HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-05-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-04-01HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2016-03-31SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-03-28SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-03-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2016-03-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-03-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2016-03-10HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-02-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BB7B60971D48EB1787257F2400643DC1/$FILE/1263_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3B8188FFCB6D5FAB87257F720080E098
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/AF08B6EE3C1B230D87257F790054E183/$FILE/Ma17.pdf#498
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9EEF200272DEB62487257F7200804671
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7E1D86A61353D2EB87257F720080134E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3B8188FFCB6D5FAB87257F720080E098
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/998B0BBEE213BE1187257F840075DAEB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/73BD5C59CFF6955F87257F840075D229
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/1AE419734F3185F587257F87004D2F85/$FILE/jour_079.pdf#578
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/0BBD1ADEB3980AE787257F8800585A28/$FILE/Ap01.pdf#683

Bill Comments

feedback