CO HB1260 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-22)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning transfers of money from the general fund to implement the state water plan, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Fund Transfer Implement State Water Plan

Sponsors

Rep. Marc Catlin [R]Rep. Alec Garnett [D]Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]
Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Adrienne Benavidez [D]Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]
Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R]Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]
Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]Rep. Thomas Exum [D]
Rep. Meg Froelich [D]Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]
Rep. Richard Holtorf [R]Rep. Edith Hooton [D]Rep. Dominique Jackson [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]
Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Susan Lontine [D]Rep. Stephanie Luck [R]
Rep. Michael Lynch [R]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]Rep. Hugh McKean [R]
Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]Rep. Patrick Neville [R]
Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Rod Pelton [R]Rep. Andres Pico [R]Rep. Janice Rich [R]
Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]Rep. Shane Sandridge [R]Rep. Emily Sirota [D]
Rep. Marc Snyder [D]Rep. Matt Soper [R]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]
Rep. Alex Valdez [D]Rep. Donald Valdez [D]Rep. Tonya Van Beber [R]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]
Rep. Perry Will [R]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]Rep. Dan Woog [R]Rep. Mary Young [D]
Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. John Cooke [R]Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]
Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]
Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Pete Lee [D]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]
Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Robert Rankin [R]Sen. Tammy Story [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1260 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1260 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24 Governor Signed
2021-06-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-12SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-30SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1260
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1260_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1260_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1260_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1260_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1260_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1260_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1260_L.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1260_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1260_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1260_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0a7a930b910c90f4872586bc006c6bd3-hb21-1260-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bfeda3f7d70867ff872586c5004f2d69-hb21-1260-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1260vote5671be
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ce97ecda93017a872586d30077b2c7-hb21-1260-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69ce97ecda93017a872586d30077b2c7-hb21-1260-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b844b63b04a7158e872586e9004ee048-hb21-1260-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1260vote5a9e70
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1260vote5c85dd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1260vote5c9a7e

Bill Comments 750

feedback