CO HB1258 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alternative Fuel Vehicle Charging Facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative Fuel Vehicle Charging Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1258 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1258 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.004 as a substitute motion (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.004 as a substitute motion (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-03 Governor Action - Signed
2012-04-27 Sent to the Governor
2012-04-24 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-04-23 Senate Second Reading Passed
2012-04-13 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-04-10 Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-03-30 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
2012-03-28 House Third Reading Passed
2012-03-26 House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-03-23 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-20 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-03-15 House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-02-07 Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7FA839D4409FF8A98725798800778F81?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7FA839D4409FF8A98725798800778F81/$FILE/1258_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7FA839D4409FF8A98725798800778F81/$FILE/1258Trans_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7FA839D4409FF8A98725798800778F81/$FILE/1258_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7FA839D4409FF8A98725798800778F81/$FILE/1258_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7FA839D4409FF8A98725798800778F81/$FILE/1258_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7FA839D4409FF8A98725798800778F81/$FILE/1258_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7FA839D4409FF8A98725798800778F81/$FILE/1258_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BE450144C7534D28872579C200684D97
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F7E4FC83FC5C80E3872579C20066B914
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B4C36EE1DE7FF323872579C200671288
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AE201498F9F63A74872579C2006066EE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5FB00C8D026A9837872579C200680F5C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/31193ED1CF56EF0E872579DC0074BDED
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F7E4FC83FC5C80E3872579C20066B914
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BE450144C7534D28872579C200684D97
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B4C36EE1DE7FF323872579C200671288
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AE201498F9F63A74872579C2006066EE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5FB00C8D026A9837872579C200680F5C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/31193ED1CF56EF0E872579DC0074BDED

Bill Comments

feedback