CO HB1257 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-22)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the recognition of veterans in relation to certain parks within the state capitol complex, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognition Of Veterans In Capitol Complex Parks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1257 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1257 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23 Governor Signed
2021-06-09 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2021-05-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-29HouseHouse Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1257
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1257_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1257_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1257_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1257_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1257_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1257_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1257_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1257_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1257_L.005.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1257_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1257_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1257_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1257_r3.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1257_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1257_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/13e4de59bdd756b9872586c6005c8548-hb21-1257-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/166413ce9eb93709872586ce0056426f-hb21-1257-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/166413ce9eb93709872586ce0056426f-hb21-1257-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1257vote5469f6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/34f0d88e41b8fd68872586df00627862-hb21-1257-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9337dd2eac4e1d80872586e300510f4d-hb21-1257-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1257vote5d362b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/13e4de59bdd756b9872586c6005c8548-hb21-1257-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback