CO HB1250 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-3)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-3)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to address law enforcement accountability, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Measures to Address Law Enforcement Accountability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.084) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.076) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.075) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.064 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.063 (Attachment H). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.062 (Attachment G). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.061 (Attachment F). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.060 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.057 (Attachment D). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.055 (Attachment I). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.050 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.043) (Y: 33 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.036) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.034) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.033) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.084) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.076) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.075) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.064 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.063 (Attachment H). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.062 (Attachment G). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.061 (Attachment F). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.060 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.057 (Attachment D). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.055 (Attachment I). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.050 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.043) (Y: 33 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.036) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.034) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.033) (Y: 24 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-05-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-18 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-21 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |