CO HB1250 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

No Medical Marijuana Ingestible Products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No Medical Marijuana Ingestible Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250, as amended, to the Finance Committee with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250, as amended, to the Finance Committee with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1250, as amended, to the Finance Committee with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-02 Governor Action - Signed
2011-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2011-05-19 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-05-18 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-11 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2011-05-11 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2011-05-09 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-05-06 Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2011-05-04 Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-04-21 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2011-04-20 House Third Reading Passed
2011-04-19 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-04-11 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-04-07 House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-03-15 House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2011-03-01 House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2011-02-09 Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F/$FILE/1250_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F/$FILE/1250jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F/$FILE/1250_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F/$FILE/1250_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F/$FILE/1250sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F/$FILE/1250_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F/$FILE/1250_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/358FCA511D41DFD2872578240056B87F/$FILE/1250_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/14776AE5C8981B5387257854006CD739
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B1FECFA3B61BD5E98725786B0068482F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1C1B85990025FE4C872578860072C7B3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/14776AE5C8981B5387257854006CD739
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B1FECFA3B61BD5E98725786B0068482F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1C1B85990025FE4C872578860072C7B3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/14776AE5C8981B5387257854006CD739
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B1FECFA3B61BD5E98725786B0068482F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1C1B85990025FE4C872578860072C7B3

Bill Comments

feedback