CO HB1249 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a microgrid roadmap for improving electric grids in the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Electric Grid Resilience And Reliability Roadmap
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1249 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1249 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 as amended by L.003. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1249 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1249 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 as amended by L.003. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 22-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2022-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |