CO HB1249 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Dept Of Personnel Modifications
Title
Dept Of Personnel Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - postponed identify (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - postponed identify (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - postponed identify (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - postponed identify (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - postponed identify (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-03-07 | House Second Reading Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-04 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-01 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development + Appropriations |