CO HB1248 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuation of the school leadership pilot program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Extend School Leadership Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1248 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1248 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1248 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-16 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |