CO HB1246 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crowdfund Intrastate Securities On-line

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crowdfund Intrastate Securities On-line

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-13HouseGovernor Signed
2015-04-07HouseSent to the Governor
2015-04-07HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-03-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-24SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-03-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2015-03-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-02-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E95B3E809BD0A27387257DA20080509A?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E95B3E809BD0A27387257DA20080509A/$FILE/1246_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E95B3E809BD0A27387257DA20080509A/$FILE/1246_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E95B3E809BD0A27387257DA20080509A/$FILE/1246_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E95B3E809BD0A27387257DA20080509A/$FILE/1246_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E95B3E809BD0A27387257DA20080509A/$FILE/1246_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/E95B3E809BD0A27387257DA20080509A/$FILE/1246_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/890D253DB73D9B5287257E060071F49A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/55A9C61AA7924EB287257E12007AAA62

Bill Comments

feedback