CO HB1245 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-04 - Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-04 - Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements that projects for broadband deployment receiving money distributed by the Colorado broadband office comply with certain fair labor practices.
Title
Fair Labor Practice Requirements for Broadband Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1245 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.005) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1245, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.005) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1245, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |