CO HB1238 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Credit Preceptors Health Profl Shortage Areas

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Credit Preceptors Health Profl Shortage Areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1238 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to add "center" after "health education" and strike "CAHEP" and substitute "CAHEC program" throughout the bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1238, as amended, to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
2015-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-03-12HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
2015-02-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment + Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D87DDDFB6F7FA2E487257DA40003106A?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D87DDDFB6F7FA2E487257DA40003106A/$FILE/1238_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D87DDDFB6F7FA2E487257DA40003106A/$FILE/1238hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D87DDDFB6F7FA2E487257DA40003106A/$FILE/1238fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8525857CBB219B2F87257E06007CD996
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D8DE2C4EA39FE24F87257E060079FC09
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D0F96DF04C3E6B4787257E0600794D46
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B4AA0AEA48C0931387257E06007BCD6C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C4CF5E561EB7F2F287257E28007D8EA5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/76EA8D32671935FF87257E28007D5597
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4B27D8757A8EB12587257E28007D2A82
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/21F7335891637FAE87257E28007D8420
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F5EDA97A8C8BA26787257E2F00503801
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D7167C64D0B417EB87257E2F005055E8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C33EA4DFBE7893CE87257E2F0050405D

Bill Comments

feedback