CO HB1237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a competitive pharmacy benefits manager marketplace.
Title
Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1237 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1237 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1237, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-21 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |