CO HB1236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the Colorado food systems advisory council, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations in the department of regulatory agencies' sunset report.
Title
Sunset Food Systems Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1236 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1236 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 18-1236, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Referred to Appropriations - No Amendments |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |