CO HB1233 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to certain procedural requirements with which a unit owners' association must comply when seeking payment of delinquent amounts owed by a unit owner.
Title
Homeowners' Association Delinquency Payments Enforcement Procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Don Wilson [R] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Dylan Roberts [D] |
Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. Mary Young [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1233, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2024-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |