CO HB1229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning presumptive eligibility for persons in need of long-term services and supports.
Title
Presumptive Eligibility for Long-Term Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1229 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1229 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |