CO HB1229 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning increased protections for unit owners in the governance of unit owners' associations under the "Colorado Common Interest Ownership Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Owners' Associations Governance Funding Record Keeping

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1229, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.011, as amended by L.022 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1229, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02 Governor Signed
2021-06-23 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-23HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-27SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2021-05-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-22HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-20HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2021-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2021-03-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1229
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1229_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1229_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1229_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1229_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1229_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1229_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1229_L.022.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1229_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1229_L.024.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1229_L.025.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1229_L.026.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1229_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1229_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1229_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f22d286b140d9105872586db0077ea97-hb21-1229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2464f090e844764f872586dd005a2d67-hb21-1229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1229vote559219
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f22d286b140d9105872586db0077ea97-hb21-1229-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f22d286b140d9105872586db0077ea97-hb21-1229-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/91abdf473c763eb3872586e2006fc5c8-hb21-1229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1229vote5ef791
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2464f090e844764f872586dd005a2d67-hb21-1229-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1229vote19690d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1229vote197b18
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/91abdf473c763eb3872586e2006fc5c8-hb21-1229-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback