CO HB1229 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a clarification of when a worker may be compensated for a claim of mental impairment for a psychologically traumatic event under workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' Compensation For Mental Impairment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |