CO HB1228 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning licensing exemptions related to pet animal facilities, including those utilizing technology in their business models.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pet Animal Care Technology Platform Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1228, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1228, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05 Governor Signed
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-05-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2017-04-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 05/01/2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2017-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2017-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2017-03-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1228
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1228_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1228_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1228_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1228_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1228_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1228_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2017a2017-03-23t133239z-hb17-1228-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hbus2017a2017-03-23t133239z-hb17-1228-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-10t133304z-hb17-1228-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-10t133304z-hb17-1228-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-10t133300z-hb17-1228-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-10t133300z-hb17-1228-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#913
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-04-24t135959z-hb17-1228-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-04-24t135959z-hb17-1228-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#951
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#950
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1239

Bill Comments

feedback