CO HB1226 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surcharge On Crimes Against At-risk Persons
Title
Surcharge On Crimes Against At-risk Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW A (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW A (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1226 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1226 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1226 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1226 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1226, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1226, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW A (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1226 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1226 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1226 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1226 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1226, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1226, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-08 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-04 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-27 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-12 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2012-03-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-03-12 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-09 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-16 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |