CO HB1224 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning penalties for accessing drugs in a manner that violates the'Colorado Food and Drug Act'.
Title
Misbranded Adulterated Counterfeit Drugs Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1224 to the Committee of the Whole with recommendation for consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1224, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1224, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1224 to the Committee of the Whole with recommendation for consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1224, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1224, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2017-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |