CO HB1222 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the jurisdiction of municipal courts to hear domestic violence offenses.
Title
Cases Of Domestic Violence In Municipal Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1222 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1222 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |