CO HB1221 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the county coroner and mortuary mental health and wellness program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
County Coroner And Mortuary Mental Health Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1221 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1221 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor Vetoed | |
2022-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-04 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |