CO HB1221 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-9)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-9)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to prevent bullying in public schools.
Title
Bullying Prevention And Education In Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1221 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1221 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2021-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |