CO HB1220 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a statewide needs assessment of services provided by veterans community living centers.
Title
Veterans Community Living Center Services Assessment
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Terri Carver [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1220 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1220, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1220, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1220, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1220, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |