CO HB1220 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning disability benefits for workers' compensation injuries, and, in connection therewith, allowing a claimant to refuse an offer of modified employment under certain circumstances, adding the loss of an ear to the list of whole person permanent impairment benefits, increasing the two aggregate limits on temporary and permanent injury benefits and requiring the director of the division of workers' compensation to adjust the limits annually, and requiring a workers' compensation insurer to pay benefits to a claimant by direct deposit upon request by the claimant.
Title
Workers'Compensation Disability Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1220 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1220 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1220, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1220 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1220 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1220, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2024-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |