CO HB1218 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of a charitable organization for purposes of state sales and use tax, and, in connection therewith, removing the limitation that a veterans' organization only gets the charitable organization exemption for purposes of sponsoring a special event, meeting, or other function in the state, so long as such event, meeting, or function is not part of the organization's regular activities in the state.
Title
Definition Of Veterans' Organizations For Sales And Use Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1218 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1218 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1218 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1218 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1218 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1218 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |