CO HB1212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation of conveyances, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2021 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Process Conveyance Regulation
Sponsors
Rep. David Ortiz [D] | Rep. Dave Williams [R] | Sen. Jessie Danielson [D] | Sen. Lisa Cutter [D] |
Sen. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D] | Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D] | Rep. Shane Sandridge [R] | Rep. Emily Sirota [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1212 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1212 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1212 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1212 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1212, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-04-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-01 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |