CO HB1209 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning offenders who committed an offense when under twenty-one years of age, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Parole Eligibility For Youthful Offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Reconsideration (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.016) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.015) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1209 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 28 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 24 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Reconsideration (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.016) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.015) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1209 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 28 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 24 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1209, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1209, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-05-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |