CO HB1209 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning repealing aeronautical reporting requirements.
Title
Aeronautical Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1209 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1209 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1209 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2019-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |