CO HB1206 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the protection of critical services through the creation of sustainable medicaid transportation safety requirements, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Transportation Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1206 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1206, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-05-25SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-05-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-21SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-12SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2021-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-06HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1206
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1206_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1206_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1206_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1206_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1206_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1206_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1206_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1206_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1206_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1206_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1206_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1206_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1206_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1206_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/babb0601a76e454e872586af0059b3b5-hb21-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/babb0601a76e454e872586af0059b3b5-hb21-1206-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69e09e986806ec67872586c0004f93e0-hb21-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/69e09e986806ec67872586c0004f93e0-hb21-1206-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1206vote5bfa3a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4a77a7988d05b82e872586d3007c37fb-hb21-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/550f4f2503077c61872586dc004ed8f7-hb21-1206-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1206vote5c2bf7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1206vote161c13
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1206vote162ed4

Bill Comments 750

feedback