CO HB1201 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning transparency of penal communications service providers in correctional facilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transparency Telecommunications Correctional Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1201 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment G) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1201, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-21SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-12SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-04-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-16HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1201
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1201_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1201_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1201_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1201_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1201_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1201_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1201_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1201_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1201_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1201_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1201_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1201_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1201_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1201_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1201_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1201_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ac13a86b9a22c6d8725869a00805abb-hb21-1201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f141241e42511a1a872586b10063d10c-hb21-1201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f141241e42511a1a872586b10063d10c-hb21-1201-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f141241e42511a1a872586b10063d10c-hb21-1201-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f141241e42511a1a872586b10063d10c-hb21-1201-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/239ae6d9d6ec0e93872586c5004ecb47-hb21-1201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/239ae6d9d6ec0e93872586c5004ecb47-hb21-1201-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1201vote5603d3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/39ad535abc24758b872586d300832056-hb21-1201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/30f3b486cf50d9e2872586dc004e8d83-hb21-1201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1201vote5cef22

Bill Comments 750

feedback