CO HB1201 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization for granting a high school diploma endorsement in the combined disciplines of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.
Title
Science Technology Engineering Math Diploma Endorsement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-18 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |