CO HB1198 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning health-care billing requirements for indigent patients receiving services not reimbursed through the Colorado indigent care program, and, in connection therewith, establishing procedures before initiating collections proceedings against a patient and making and reducing appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health-care Billing Requirements For Indigent Patients

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1198, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1198, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1198, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-25SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2021-05-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-21HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1198
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1198_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1198_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1198_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1198_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1198_rer.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1198_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1198_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1198_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1198_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1198_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1198_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1198_L.008.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1198_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1198_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1198_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1198_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8577289b6c5ab2f6872586be006b3c9e-hb21-1198-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8577289b6c5ab2f6872586be006b3c9e-hb21-1198-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8577289b6c5ab2f6872586be006b3c9e-hb21-1198-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8577289b6c5ab2f6872586be006b3c9e-hb21-1198-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1bb9e68a8154342872586d2004d5b75-hb21-1198-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1bb9e68a8154342872586d2004d5b75-hb21-1198-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1198vote54d7c1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dbfa2295a640137f872586e0006f97c0-hb21-1198-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a5e9d823740e4903872586e9004e4724-hb21-1198-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1198vote6e9406
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1198vote5b5976
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1198vote5bfe83
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1198vote5c1697

Bill Comments 750

feedback