CO HB1195 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Human Trafficking
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Wright [R] | Sen. Owen Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. After J.001 was reconsidered, this was offered and adopted instead. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - reconsider J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole -WD (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. After J.001 was reconsidered, this was offered and adopted instead. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - reconsider J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole -WD (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. After J.001 was reconsidered, this was offered and adopted instead. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - reconsider J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole -WD (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. After J.001 was reconsidered, this was offered and adopted instead. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - reconsider J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole -WD (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute motion to adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |
2013-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations |