CO HB1193 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Access Ofc Respondent Parents' Counsel
Title
Electronic Access Ofc Respondent Parents' Counsel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1193 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1193 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1193 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1193 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1193 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1193 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1193 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1193 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-04-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2016-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |