CO HB1193 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced Industries Export Acceleration Program
Title
Advanced Industries Export Acceleration Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1193 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2013-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |