CO HB1185 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Issuance Of Travel Insurance Policies
Title
Issuance Of Travel Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment no appropriation clause; ruled out of order The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Lay over to next appropriations meeting; ruled out of order The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment no appropriation clause; ruled out of order The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Lay over to next appropriations meeting; ruled out of order The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment no appropriation clause; ruled out of order The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Lay over to next appropriations meeting; ruled out of order The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment no appropriation clause; ruled out of order The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Lay over to next appropriations meeting; ruled out of order The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2014-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |